Senate | 03/14/2022 | Died in Commerce and Tourism | ||
Senate | 03/12/2022 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | ||
Senate | 02/11/2022 | Now in Commerce and Tourism | ||
Senate | 02/10/2022 | CS by Regulated Industries read 1st time | ||
Senate | 02/09/2022 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | ||
Senate | 02/08/2022 | CS by Regulated Industries; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 02/03/2022 | On Committee agenda-- Regulated Industries, 02/08/22, 12:30 pm, 412 Knott Building | ||
Senate | 01/18/2022 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 01/12/2022 | Referred to Regulated Industries; Commerce and Tourism; Rules | ||
Senate | 01/07/2022 | Filed |