Senate | 03/14/2022 | Died in Finance and Tax | ||
Senate | 03/12/2022 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | ||
Senate | 01/25/2022 | Now in Finance and Tax | ||
Senate | 01/24/2022 | Favorable by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 8 NAYS 1 | ||
Senate | 01/19/2022 | On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 01/24/22, 3:00 pm, 110 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 01/18/2022 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 01/12/2022 | Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Finance and Tax; Appropriations | ||
Senate | 01/10/2022 | Filed |