Senate | 03/14/2022 | Died in Criminal Justice | ||
Senate | 03/12/2022 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | ||
Senate | 02/01/2022 | Now in Criminal Justice | ||
Senate | 01/31/2022 | Favorable by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 01/26/2022 | On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 01/31/22, 3:00 pm, 110 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 01/18/2022 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 01/12/2022 | Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Criminal Justice; Rules | ||
Senate | 01/10/2022 | Filed |