Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 1435
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Substituted CS/HB 1435
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/04/22
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2022
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2022
|
Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 11 NAYS 6
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/15/22, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2022
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2022
|
Favorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2022
|
CS by Transportation read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 02/08/22, 3:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2022
|
Now in Community Affairs
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2022
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2022
|
CS by Transportation; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Transportation, 02/02/22, 8:30 am, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2022
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2022
|
Referred to Transportation; Community Affairs; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2022
|
Filed
|
|
|