Senate | 02/17/2022 | Laid on Table, refer to HB 5003 | ||
Senate | 02/17/2022 | Substituted HB 5003 | ||
Senate | 02/17/2022 | Read 2nd time | ||
Senate | 02/16/2022 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 02/10/2022 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/17/22 | ||
Senate | 02/10/2022 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading | ||
Senate | 02/10/2022 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/09/2022 | Submitted as Committee Bill and Reported Favorably by Appropriations; YEAS 19 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 02/04/2022 | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/09/22, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building | ||
Senate | 02/04/2022 | Submitted for consideration by Appropriations |