Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S7008 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 1, 2021

Enrolled

Bill March 6, 2022

Analysis

Analysis January 13, 2022
Analysis January 12, 2022
Analysis November 30, 2021
Analysis November 29, 2021

Prefiled

Bill November 22, 2021