05/12/2022 | Chapter No. 2022-109 | |||
05/12/2022 | Approved by Governor | |||
05/05/2022 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |||
Senate | 03/04/2022 | Ordered enrolled | ||
House | 03/04/2022 | Passed; YEAS 111, NAYS 0 | ||
House | 03/04/2022 | Read 3rd time | ||
House | 03/03/2022 | Added to Third Reading Calendar | ||
House | 03/03/2022 | Placed on 3rd reading | ||
House | 03/03/2022 | Substituted for HB 7043 | ||
House | 03/03/2022 | Read 2nd time | ||
House | 02/28/2022 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 02/28/2022 | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/3/2022) | ||
House | 02/28/2022 | Bill referred to House Calendar | ||
House | 01/19/2022 | In Messages | ||
Senate | 01/19/2022 | Immediately certified | ||
Senate | 01/19/2022 | Passed; YEAS 35 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 01/13/2022 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 01/19/22 | ||
Senate | 01/13/2022 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading | ||
Senate | 01/13/2022 | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 01/11/2022 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 01/10/2022 | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 01/13/22, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building | ||
Senate | 01/05/2022 | Referred to Rules | ||
Senate | 12/02/2021 | Filed | ||
Senate | 12/01/2021 | Submitted as Committee Bill and Reported Favorably by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 11/22/2021 | On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 12/01/21, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building | ||
Senate | 11/22/2021 | Submitted for consideration by Banking and Insurance |