Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S7022 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 14, 2022

Analysis

Analysis February 22, 2022
Analysis February 21, 2022
Analysis January 14, 2022
Analysis January 12, 2022

Prefiled

Bill January 10, 2022