Senate | 02/17/2022 | Laid on Table, refer to HB 7009 | ||
Senate | 02/17/2022 | Substituted HB 7009 | ||
Senate | 02/17/2022 | Read 2nd time | ||
Senate | 02/10/2022 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/17/22 | ||
Senate | 02/03/2022 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading | ||
Senate | 02/03/2022 | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 16 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 01/31/2022 | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/03/22, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building | ||
Senate | 01/26/2022 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 01/26/2022 | Referred to Rules | ||
Senate | 01/18/2022 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/18/2022 | Submitted as Committee Bill and Reported Favorably by Criminal Justice; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 01/13/2022 | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 01/18/22, 11:00 am, 110 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 01/13/2022 | Submitted for consideration by Criminal Justice |