Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S7032 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 18, 2022

Analysis

Analysis February 3, 2022
Analysis February 1, 2022
Analysis January 18, 2022
Analysis January 14, 2022

Prefiled

Bill January 13, 2022