Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S7036 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 20, 2022

Enrolled

Bill March 6, 2022

Analysis

Analysis February 3, 2022
Analysis February 1, 2022
Analysis January 18, 2022
Analysis January 14, 2022

Prefiled

Bill January 13, 2022