Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S7038 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 26, 2022

Analysis

Analysis February 10, 2022
Analysis February 8, 2022
Analysis January 26, 2022
Analysis January 25, 2022

Prefiled

Bill January 21, 2022