Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S7040 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 14, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill February 24, 2022

Analysis

Analysis February 24, 2022
Analysis February 21, 2022
Analysis February 11, 2022
Analysis February 8, 2022
Analysis January 31, 2022

Prefiled

Bill January 27, 2022