Senate | 03/14/2022 | Died on Calendar | ||
Senate | 03/12/2022 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | ||
Senate | 03/01/2022 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading | ||
Senate | 02/28/2022 | Favorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 19 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 02/23/2022 | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/28/22, 10:30 am, 412 Knott Building | ||
Senate | 02/16/2022 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 02/16/2022 | Referred to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 02/10/2022 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/10/2022 | Submitted as Committee Bill and Reported Favorably by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 02/07/2022 | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 02/10/22, 8:30 am, 37 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 02/07/2022 | Submitted for consideration by Governmental Oversight and Accountability |