03/16/2023 | Chapter No. 2023-6 | |||
03/15/2023 | Approved by Governor | |||
03/02/2023 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |||
House | 02/10/2023 | Ordered enrolled | ||
Senate | 02/10/2023 | Passed; YEAS 34 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 02/10/2023 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/10/23 | ||
Senate | 02/10/2023 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading | ||
Senate | 02/10/2023 | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 18 NAYS 0 | ||
House | 02/10/2023 | In Messages | ||
Senate | 02/10/2023 | Read 3rd time | ||
Senate | 02/10/2023 | Read 2nd time | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/10/23, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | Received | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | Referred to Rules | ||
House | 02/09/2023 | Passed; YEAS 111, NAYS 2 | ||
House | 02/08/2023 | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (2/9/2023) | ||
House | 02/08/2023 | Added to Second Reading Calendar | ||
House | 02/08/2023 | Bill released to House Calendar | ||
House | 02/08/2023 | Reported out of State Affairs Committee | ||
House | 02/08/2023 | Favorable by State Affairs Committee | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Added to State Affairs Committee agenda | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Now in State Affairs Committee | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Referred to State Affairs Committee | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Filed |