11/14/2023 | Chapter No. 2023-350 | |||
11/13/2023 | Approved by Governor | |||
11/13/2023 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |||
House | 11/08/2023 | Ordered enrolled | ||
Senate | 11/08/2023 | Passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 11/08/2023 | Substituted for SB 4-C | ||
Senate | 11/08/2023 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading | ||
Senate | 11/08/2023 | Withdrawn from Fiscal Policy | ||
House | 11/08/2023 | In Messages | ||
Senate | 11/08/2023 | Read 3rd time | ||
Senate | 11/08/2023 | Read 2nd time | ||
Senate | 11/07/2023 | Received | ||
Senate | 11/07/2023 | Referred to Fiscal Policy | ||
House | 11/07/2023 | Passed; YEAS 111, NAYS 0 | ||
House | 11/07/2023 | Added to Third Reading Calendar | ||
House | 11/07/2023 | Amendment 179775 not allowed for consideration | ||
House | 11/07/2023 | Amendment 057163 not allowed for consideration | ||
House | 11/07/2023 | Amendment 555575 Failed | ||
House | 11/06/2023 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 11/06/2023 | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (11/7/2023) | ||
House | 11/06/2023 | Bill released to House Calendar | ||
House | 11/06/2023 | Reported out of Appropriations Committee | ||
House | 11/06/2023 | Favorable by Appropriations Committee | ||
House | 11/02/2023 | Added to Appropriations Committee agenda | ||
House | 11/02/2023 | Now in Appropriations Committee | ||
House | 11/02/2023 | Referred to Appropriations Committee | ||
House | 11/02/2023 | Filed |