11/14/2023 | Chapter No. 2023-351 | |||
11/13/2023 | Approved by Governor | |||
11/13/2023 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |||
House | 11/08/2023 | Ordered enrolled | ||
Senate | 11/08/2023 | Passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 11/08/2023 | Substituted for SB 10-C | ||
Senate | 11/08/2023 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading | ||
Senate | 11/08/2023 | Withdrawn from Rules | ||
House | 11/08/2023 | In Messages | ||
Senate | 11/08/2023 | Read 3rd time | ||
Senate | 11/08/2023 | Read 2nd time | ||
Senate | 11/07/2023 | Received | ||
Senate | 11/07/2023 | Referred to Rules | ||
House | 11/07/2023 | Passed; YEAS 100, NAYS 2 | ||
House | 11/07/2023 | Added to Third Reading Calendar | ||
House | 11/06/2023 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 11/06/2023 | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (11/7/2023) | ||
House | 11/06/2023 | Bill released to House Calendar | ||
House | 11/06/2023 | Reported out of State Affairs Committee | ||
House | 11/06/2023 | Favorable by State Affairs Committee | ||
House | 11/02/2023 | Added to State Affairs Committee agenda | ||
House | 11/02/2023 | Now in State Affairs Committee | ||
House | 11/02/2023 | Referred to State Affairs Committee | ||
House | 11/02/2023 | Filed |