House | 05/05/2023 | Died in Appropriations Committee; companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7063 (Ch. 2023-157) | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | Now in Appropriations Committee | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | Reported out of Ways & Means Committee | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | Favorable by Ways & Means Committee | ||
House | 03/28/2023 | Added to Ways & Means Committee agenda | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 12/23/2022 | Now in Ways & Means Committee | ||
House | 12/23/2022 | Referred to Appropriations Committee | ||
House | 12/23/2022 | Referred to Ways & Means Committee | ||
House | 12/06/2022 | Filed |