Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0049 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 14, 2022

Enrolled

Bill May 4, 2023

Analysis

Analysis May 31, 2023
Analysis May 9, 2023
Analysis March 31, 2023
Analysis March 29, 2023
Analysis March 21, 2023
Analysis March 17, 2023
Analysis February 23, 2023
Analysis February 16, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill March 31, 2023
Bill March 21, 2023
Bill February 24, 2023