Senate
|
05/05/2023
|
Died in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Referred to Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
In Messages
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 84, NAYS 30
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Amendment 445341 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/25/2023)
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Temporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/18/2023)
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Reported out of Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Favorable with CS by Commerce Committee (Amended)
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
Added to Commerce Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
Now in Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
Reported out of Insurance & Banking Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
Favorable by Insurance & Banking Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Added to Insurance & Banking Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/10/2023
|
Now in Insurance & Banking Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/10/2023
|
Referred to Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/10/2023
|
Referred to Insurance & Banking Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
12/16/2022
|
Filed
|
|
|