House | 05/05/2023 | Died in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | Now in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | Reported out of Criminal Justice Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | Favorable by Criminal Justice Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/08/2023 | Added to Criminal Justice Subcommittee agenda | ||
House | 01/10/2023 | Now in Criminal Justice Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/10/2023 | Referred to Judiciary Committee | ||
House | 01/10/2023 | Referred to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/10/2023 | Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee | ||
House | 12/19/2022 | Filed |