LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Florida FL
Legislatures
2023 Regular Session
House
Bills
H0097
Draft Versions
FL
Florida House Bill H0097
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Florida 2023 Regular Session
Florida House Bill H0097
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
January 3, 2023
Compare
Analysis
Analysis
May 30, 2023
Analysis
May 17, 2023
Analysis
March 23, 2023
Analysis
March 21, 2023
Analysis
March 9, 2023
Analysis
March 7, 2023
Analysis
February 14, 2023
Analysis
February 8, 2023
Comm Sub
Bill
March 9, 2023
Compare
Bill
February 15, 2023
Compare