House | 05/05/2023 | Died in Education & Employment Committee | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 02/01/2023 | Added to Education & Employment Committee agenda | ||
House | 01/20/2023 | Now in Education & Employment Committee | ||
House | 01/20/2023 | Original reference removed: Commerce Committee | ||
House | 01/20/2023 | Referred to Education & Employment Committee | ||
House | 01/18/2023 | CS Filed | ||
House | 01/18/2023 | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) | ||
House | 01/18/2023 | Reported out of Postsecondary Education & Workforce Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/17/2023 | Favorable with CS by Postsecondary Education & Workforce Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/10/2023 | Added to Postsecondary Education & Workforce Subcommittee agenda | ||
House | 01/10/2023 | Now in Postsecondary Education & Workforce Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/10/2023 | Referred to Commerce Committee | ||
House | 01/10/2023 | Referred to Postsecondary Education & Workforce Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/03/2023 | Filed |