Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0119 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 5, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 1, 2023

Analysis

Analysis June 19, 2023
Analysis May 17, 2023
Analysis March 23, 2023
Analysis March 21, 2023
Analysis February 15, 2023
Analysis February 10, 2023