Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0127 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 6, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 11, 2023
Analysis April 7, 2023
Analysis March 29, 2023
Analysis March 27, 2023
Analysis March 15, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill March 15, 2023