Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0143 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 9, 2023

Analysis

Analysis June 19, 2023
Analysis May 16, 2023
Analysis April 24, 2023
Analysis April 23, 2023
Analysis March 15, 2023
Analysis March 13, 2023
Analysis February 23, 2023
Analysis February 20, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill March 15, 2023
Bill February 23, 2023