House | 05/05/2023 | Died in Commerce Committee; companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7063 (Ch. 2023-157) | ||
House | 03/31/2023 | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) | ||
House | 03/31/2023 | Now in Commerce Committee | ||
House | 03/31/2023 | Original reference removed: Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/31/2023 | Referred to Commerce Committee | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | CS Filed | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | Reported out of Ways & Means Committee | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | Favorable with CS by Ways & Means Committee | ||
House | 03/28/2023 | Added to Ways & Means Committee agenda | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 01/25/2023 | Now in Ways & Means Committee | ||
House | 01/25/2023 | Referred to Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/25/2023 | Referred to Ways & Means Committee | ||
House | 01/17/2023 | Filed |