Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0237 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 18, 2023

Analysis

Analysis June 19, 2023
Analysis May 17, 2023
Analysis March 14, 2023
Analysis March 12, 2023
Analysis March 9, 2023
Analysis March 7, 2023
Analysis February 15, 2023
Analysis February 8, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill February 15, 2023