House
|
05/02/2023
|
Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 676 (Ch. 2023-220)
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Now in Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Original reference removed: Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Referred to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Reported out of Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
Favorable with CS by Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
Added to Health & Human Services Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Now in Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Reported out of Education & Employment Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Favorable by Education & Employment Committee (Amended)
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
Added to Education & Employment Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2023
|
Now in Education & Employment Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2023
|
Referred to Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2023
|
Referred to Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2023
|
Referred to Education & Employment Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|