Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0269 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 19, 2023

Enrolled

Bill April 26, 2023

Analysis

Analysis May 18, 2023
Analysis March 31, 2023
Analysis March 29, 2023
Analysis March 15, 2023
Analysis March 13, 2023
Analysis March 8, 2023
Analysis March 3, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill March 31, 2023
Bill March 8, 2023