House | 05/05/2023 | Died in Commerce Committee | ||
House | 03/31/2023 | Now in Commerce Committee | ||
House | 03/31/2023 | Original reference removed: Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/31/2023 | Original reference removed: Ways & Means Committee | ||
House | 03/31/2023 | Referred to Commerce Committee | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | CS Filed | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Reported out of Transportation & Modals Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Favorable with CS by Transportation & Modals Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | PCS added to Transportation & Modals Subcommittee agenda | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 02/01/2023 | Now in Transportation & Modals Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/01/2023 | Referred to Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/01/2023 | Referred to Ways & Means Committee | ||
House | 02/01/2023 | Referred to Transportation & Modals Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/23/2023 | Filed |