Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0339 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 23, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 4, 2023

Analysis

Analysis June 27, 2023
Analysis May 15, 2023
Analysis April 26, 2023
Analysis April 24, 2023
Analysis March 23, 2023
Analysis March 21, 2023
Analysis March 15, 2023
Analysis March 13, 2023
Analysis February 23, 2023
Analysis February 15, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill February 23, 2023