House
|
05/05/2023
|
Died on Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Bill released to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Reported out of State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Favorable by State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added to State Affairs Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Now in State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Reported out of Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Favorable by Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
Added to Appropriations Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Now in Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Reported out of Constitutional Rights, Rule of Law & Government Operations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Favorable by Constitutional Rights, Rule of Law & Government Operations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
Added to Constitutional Rights, Rule of Law & Government Operations Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2023
|
Now in Constitutional Rights, Rule of Law & Government Operations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2023
|
Referred to State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2023
|
Referred to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2023
|
Referred to Constitutional Rights, Rule of Law & Government Operations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|