Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0389 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 23, 2023

Engrossed

Bill May 4, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 5, 2023

Analysis

Analysis May 18, 2023
Analysis May 17, 2023
Analysis April 11, 2023
Analysis April 7, 2023
Analysis March 30, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill March 30, 2023