Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0411 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 24, 2023

Engrossed

Bill May 4, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 5, 2023

Analysis

Analysis May 19, 2023
Analysis May 16, 2023
Analysis March 23, 2023
Analysis March 21, 2023
Analysis March 15, 2023
Analysis March 10, 2023
Analysis March 8, 2023
Analysis March 6, 2023