|
06/06/2023
|
Chapter No. 2023-197; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 1305 (Ch. 2023-70)
|
|
|
|
06/05/2023
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
05/23/2023
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
CS passed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Substituted for CS/CS/CS/SB 64
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Withdrawn from Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Referred to Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 113, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Amendment 122593 adopted as amended
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Amendment 017767 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Amendment 911303 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 3)
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/25/2023)
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Reported out of Infrastructure Strategies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Favorable with CS by Infrastructure Strategies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Added to Infrastructure Strategies Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Now in Infrastructure Strategies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Referred to Infrastructure Strategies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Reported out of Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Favorable with CS by Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Added to Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Now in Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Referred to Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Reported out of Transportation & Modals Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Favorable with CS by Transportation & Modals Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
PCS added to Transportation & Modals Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2023
|
Now in Transportation & Modals Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2023
|
Referred to Transportation & Modals Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|