Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0439 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 24, 2023

Analysis

Analysis May 18, 2023
Analysis April 20, 2023
Analysis April 17, 2023
Analysis April 12, 2023
Analysis April 6, 2023
Analysis March 13, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 20, 2023
Bill April 12, 2023
Bill March 13, 2023