House | 05/05/2023 | Died in PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/31/2023 | Now in PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/31/2023 | Referred to Education & Employment Committee | ||
House | 03/31/2023 | Referred to PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | CS Filed | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | Reported out of Education Quality Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Favorable with CS by Education Quality Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | PCS added to Education Quality Subcommittee agenda | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 02/01/2023 | Now in Education Quality Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/01/2023 | Referred to Education Quality Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/24/2023 | Filed |