House | 05/05/2023 | Died in Education & Employment Committee | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | Now in Education & Employment Committee | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | Original reference removed: Postsecondary Education & Workforce Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | Referred to Education & Employment Committee | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | CS Filed | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Reported out of Choice & Innovation Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Favorable with CS by Choice & Innovation Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/17/2023 | PCS added to Choice & Innovation Subcommittee agenda | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 02/01/2023 | Now in Choice & Innovation Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/01/2023 | Referred to Postsecondary Education & Workforce Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/01/2023 | Referred to Choice & Innovation Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/24/2023 | Filed |