House | 05/05/2023 | Died in Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Now in Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Reported out of Ways & Means Committee | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Favorable by Ways & Means Committee | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | Added to Ways & Means Committee agenda | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 02/01/2023 | Now in Ways & Means Committee | ||
House | 02/01/2023 | Referred to State Affairs Committee | ||
House | 02/01/2023 | Referred to Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/01/2023 | Referred to Ways & Means Committee | ||
House | 01/24/2023 | Filed |