Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0491 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 24, 2023

Analysis

Analysis June 19, 2023
Analysis May 18, 2023
Analysis March 31, 2023
Analysis March 29, 2023
Analysis March 20, 2023
Analysis March 17, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill March 20, 2023