House | 05/05/2023 | Died in Ethics, Elections & Open Government Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/13/2023 | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) | ||
House | 03/13/2023 | Now in Ethics, Elections & Open Government Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/13/2023 | Referred to Judiciary Committee | ||
House | 03/13/2023 | Referred to Ethics, Elections & Open Government Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/10/2023 | CS Filed | ||
House | 03/10/2023 | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) | ||
House | 03/10/2023 | Reported out of Civil Justice Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | Favorable with CS by Civil Justice Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | Added to Civil Justice Subcommittee agenda | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Now in Civil Justice Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/25/2023 | Filed |