House | 05/05/2023 | Died in Ways & Means Committee; companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7063 (Ch. 2023-157) | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | Now in Ways & Means Committee | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | Reported out of Energy, Communications & Cybersecurity Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | Favorable by Energy, Communications & Cybersecurity Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/03/2023 | Added to Energy, Communications & Cybersecurity Subcommittee agenda | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Now in Energy, Communications & Cybersecurity Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Referred to Commerce Committee | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Referred to Ways & Means Committee | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Referred to Energy, Communications & Cybersecurity Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/26/2023 | Filed |