Senate | 05/05/2023 | Died in Rules | ||
Senate | 03/31/2023 | Received | ||
Senate | 03/31/2023 | Referred to Rules | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | In Messages | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | Adopted as amended | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | Amendment 244769 adopted | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | Read 2nd time | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/30/2023) | ||
House | 03/17/2023 | Added to Second Reading Calendar | ||
House | 03/17/2023 | Bill released to House Calendar | ||
House | 03/17/2023 | Reported out of Health & Human Services Committee | ||
House | 03/17/2023 | Favorable by Health & Human Services Committee | ||
House | 03/15/2023 | Added to Health & Human Services Committee agenda | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | Now in Health & Human Services Committee | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | Reported out of Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | Favorable by Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | Added to Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee agenda | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Now in Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Referred to Health & Human Services Committee | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Referred to Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/01/2023 | Filed |