Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0607 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 3, 2023

Enrolled

Bill April 26, 2023

Analysis

Analysis May 25, 2023
Analysis May 5, 2023
Analysis April 12, 2023
Analysis April 6, 2023
Analysis March 21, 2023
Analysis March 17, 2023
Analysis March 9, 2023
Analysis March 7, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 13, 2023