House | 05/05/2023 | Died in Appropriations Committee | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | Now in Appropriations Committee | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | Reported out of Constitutional Rights, Rule of Law & Government Operations Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | Favorable by Constitutional Rights, Rule of Law & Government Operations Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | Added to Constitutional Rights, Rule of Law & Government Operations Subcommittee agenda | ||
House | 02/14/2023 | Now in Constitutional Rights, Rule of Law & Government Operations Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/14/2023 | Referred to State Affairs Committee | ||
House | 02/14/2023 | Referred to Appropriations Committee | ||
House | 02/14/2023 | Referred to Constitutional Rights, Rule of Law & Government Operations Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Filed |