Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0621 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 6, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 1, 2023

Analysis

Analysis June 1, 2023
Analysis May 12, 2023
Analysis April 12, 2023
Analysis April 7, 2023
Analysis March 28, 2023
Analysis March 24, 2023
Analysis March 20, 2023
Analysis March 16, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 12, 2023