Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0625 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 6, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 2, 2023

Analysis

Analysis June 23, 2023
Analysis May 19, 2023
Analysis April 11, 2023
Analysis April 6, 2023
Analysis March 29, 2023
Analysis March 24, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 12, 2023
Bill March 29, 2023