LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Florida FL
Legislatures
2023 Regular Session
House
Bills
H0645
Draft Versions
FL
Florida House Bill H0645
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Florida 2023 Regular Session
Florida House Bill H0645
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
February 7, 2023
Compare
Enrolled
Bill
May 1, 2023
Compare
Analysis
Analysis
May 30, 2023
Analysis
May 4, 2023
Analysis
March 28, 2023
Analysis
March 23, 2023
Analysis
March 21, 2023
Analysis
March 17, 2023
Analysis
March 12, 2023
Analysis
March 8, 2023
Comm Sub
Bill
March 28, 2023
Compare
Bill
March 13, 2023
Compare