Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0655 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 8, 2023

Analysis

Analysis June 19, 2023
Analysis May 17, 2023
Analysis March 26, 2023
Analysis March 23, 2023
Analysis March 9, 2023
Analysis March 7, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill March 27, 2023
Bill March 9, 2023